Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0540493 | Global Dossier | 20.03.1996 | B1 | EP0540493 | 05.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE135553T | 15.04.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1005479 | 03.08.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69209226T | 25.07.1996 | T2 | DE69209226D1 | 25.04.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0540493T | 05.08.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2084990T | 16.05.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI103949B | 29.10.1999 | B1 | FI103949B | 29.10.1999 | B | FI924857 | 01.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3019403T | 30.06.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO310494B | 16.07.2001 | B1 | NO924191L | 03.05.1993 | L | NO924191D0 | 30.10.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | BE9101010 | 31.10.1991 |