EP0556286 - METHOD WITH INSPECTION AUDITING FOR IMAGES PRESENTED ON A DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/34] | INSPECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH INSPECTION AUDITING FOR IMAGES PRESENTED ON A DISPLAY | ||
[1998/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEUROMEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC 2 Executive Blvd. Suite 306 Suffern, NY 10901-4114 / US | [1994/28] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states RUTENBERG, Mark R. 128 West Maple Avenue Monsey, NY 10952 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUTENBERG, Mark R. 128 West Maple Avenue Monsey, NY 10952 / US | [1994/28] |
Former [1993/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | Powell, Timothy John D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92900030.5 | 01.11.1991 | [1993/34] | WO1991US08099 | Priority number, date | US19900610423 | 07.11.1990 Original published format: US 610423 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209047 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556286 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556286 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
G02B21/365 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
Y10S715/961 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/34] | Title | German: | UNTERSUCHUNGSKONTROLLVERFAHREN FÜR BILDER DIE AUF EINER ANZEIGE GEZEIGT WERDEN | [1998/36] | English: | METHOD WITH INSPECTION AUDITING FOR IMAGES PRESENTED ON A DISPLAY | [1998/36] | French: | PROCEDE D'INSPECTION AVEC VERIFICATION DU PROCEDE D'INSPECTION POUR DES IMAGES PRESENTEES SUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [1998/36] |
Former [1993/34] | UNTERSUCHUNGSGERÄT UND UNTERSUCHUNGSKONTROLLVERFAHREN FÜR BILDER DIE AUF EINER ANZEIGE GEZEIGT WERDEN | ||
Former [1993/34] | INSPECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH INSPECTION AUDITING FOR IMAGES PRESENTED ON A DISPLAY | ||
Former [1993/34] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'INSPECTION AVEC VERIFICATION DU PROCEDE D'INSPECTION POUR DES IMAGES PRESENTEES SUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.1999 | BE | 07.04.1999 | CH | 07.04.1999 | ES | 07.04.1999 | FR | 07.04.1999 | GR | 07.04.1999 | IT | 07.04.1999 | LI | 07.04.1999 | SE | 07.04.1999 | DK | 07.07.1999 | LU | 01.11.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
ES | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
SE | 07.04.1999 | ||
DK | 07.07.1999 | ||
LU | 01.11.1999 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
ES | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
SE | 07.04.1999 | ||
DK | 07.07.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
LU | 01.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
ES | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
SE | 07.04.1999 | ||
DK | 07.07.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
ES | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
SE | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
SE | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
GR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
CH | 12.07.1999 | ||
LI | 12.07.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 07.04.1999 | |
BE | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 07.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4404683 (KOBAYASHI SHIGEKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4464652 (LAPSON WILLIAM F [US], et al); | [Y]US4587520 (ASTLE BRIAN [US]); | [X]US4952051 (LOVELL DOUGLAS C, et al); | [A]US4965725 (RUTENBERG MARK R [US]) | [Y] - Brochure from Neuromedical Systems, Inc., "New Papnet Cytological Screening System", October 1989, 6 pages. |