EP0569363 - NMR FREQUENCY LOCKING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELBIT-ATI, LTD. Advanced Technology Center, P.O. Box 539 Haifa 31053 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states Elbit-ATI, Ltd. Advanced Technology Center, P.O. Box 539 Haifa 31053 / IL | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHTRONICS, INC. 501 West Lake Street, Suite 202 Elmhurst, Illinois 60126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANOSH, Richard, L. c/o Argon National Labs 9700 South Cast Avenue Argon, IL 60439 / US | [1998/13] |
Former [1993/46] | 01 /
PANOSH, Richard, L. 717 Front Street Lisle, IL 60532 / US | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Howick, Nicholas Keith CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92900092.5 | 06.11.1991 | [1993/46] | WO1991US08294 | Priority number, date | US19900610366 | 07.11.1990 Original published format: US 610366 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208996 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569363 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569363 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/38, G01R33/46 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
G01R33/3607 (EP,US);
G01V3/00 (KR);
G01R33/389 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/46] | G01V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | NMR-FREQUENZVERRIEGELUNGSKREIS | [1993/46] | English: | NMR FREQUENCY LOCKING CIRCUIT | [1993/46] | French: | CIRCUIT DE VERROUILLAGE DE FREQUENCE RMN | [1993/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.1998 | BE | 25.03.1998 | CH | 25.03.1998 | ES | 25.03.1998 | FR | 25.03.1998 | GR | 25.03.1998 | IT | 25.03.1998 | LI | 25.03.1998 | DK | 25.06.1998 | SE | 25.06.1998 | LU | 06.11.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
ES | 25.03.1998 | ||
FR | 25.03.1998 | ||
GR | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
DK | 25.06.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
LU | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
ES | 25.03.1998 | ||
GR | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
DK | 25.06.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
LU | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
ES | 25.03.1998 | ||
GR | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
DK | 25.06.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
ES | 25.03.1998 | ||
GR | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
GR | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
IT | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
CH | 25.03.1998 | ||
LI | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
BE | 25.03.1998 | ||
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 25.03.1998 | |
SE | 25.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 25.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3174099 (LARSON MARLO J) [A] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 35; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US3725776 (PETRINOVIC M) [A] 1,2,6,7,12,13* column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2019006 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES) [A] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 114 *; | [A]US4339717 (TSUDA MUNETAKA, et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * column 2, line 60 - column 6, line 37; figures 1,2 * | [A] - J.R. ANDERSON ET AL., "LOW LEVEL TRACKING MARGINAL OSCILLATOR FO IN SITU MAGNETIC FIELD MEASUREMENTS AT LOW TEMPERATURES", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS., NEW YORK US, (19720801), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 1129 - 1133 [A] 1,2,6,7,12,13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3609519 (SEKI TOSHIMASA, et al) | [X] - Journal of Research of the National Bureau of Standards, Volume 74C, NOS. 1 and 2, January-June 1970 (Institute of Materials Research, NBS Washington, D.C.) R. C. FRISCH et al. "Locked NQR Spectrometer for Pressure Measurements", see pages 3-8. |