Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06503873 | Global Dossier | 28.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0560834 | Global Dossier | 17.08.1994 | B1 | EP0560834 | 22.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT398488B | 27.12.1994 | B | ATA248390 | 15.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE110115T | 15.09.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ102193 | 19.01.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4103156 | 17.06.1993 | C2 | DE4103156 | 13.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59102583D1 | 22.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | DE59102583 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO179797C | 18.12.1996 | C | NO179797B | 09.09.1996 | B | NO932051L | 04.06.1993 | L | NO932051D0 | 04.06.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2087252 | 20.08.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK55393 | 09.09.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5465943 | 14.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9102305 | 04.12.1991 | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA919672 | 30.09.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9210593 | Global Dossier | 25.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU645386B | Global Dossier | 13.01.1994 | B2 | AU9030591 | 08.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2097924 | 04.02.1997 | C | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0560834T | 30.01.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2057981T | 16.10.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT248390 | 07.12.1990 | DE4103156 | 02.02.1991 |