EP0560834 - BOTTOM OR WALL STRUCTURE FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEITSCH-RADEX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FÜR FEUERFESTE ERZEUGNISSE Mommsengasse 35 A-1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states VEITSCH-RADEX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FÜR FEUERFESTE ERZEUGNISSE Mommsengasse 35 A-1040 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINNHOFER, Johann Anschützgasse 17 A-1150 Wien / AT | 02 /
SCHMIDBERGER, Robert Hafning 46B A-8793 Trofaiach / AT | 03 /
PAWLISKA, Volker Grantsch 15 A-9872 Millstatt / AT | 04 /
CAPPELLI, Giorgio Residenza Solco, 1151 I-20089 Basiglio / IT | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker und Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92900109.7 | 04.12.1991 | [1993/38] | WO1991EP02305 | Priority number, date | AT19900002483 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: AT 248390 | DE19914103156 | 02.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4103156 | [1993/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210593 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560834 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560834 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, C21C7/072, B22D1/00, F27D3/16 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
B22D1/005 (EP,US);
B22D41/02 (EP,US);
C21C5/5217 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | BODEN- ODER WANDAUSBILDUNG FÜR EIN METALLURGISCHES GEFÄSS | [1993/38] | English: | BOTTOM OR WALL STRUCTURE FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL | [1993/38] | French: | STRUCTURE DU FOND OU DES PAROIS DE RECIPIENTS METALLURGIQUES | [1993/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 28.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU648343 ; | [A]FR2451945 (EST ACIERS FINS); | [A]DE3619533 (KLOECKNER STAHL GMBH); | [Y]DE3742861 (THYSSEN STAHL AG); | [A]DE9004945U ; | [A]DE3926786 | [Y] - Soviet inventions illustrated section m/p,week 7945,19 dec 1979 Derwent Publications ltd, London, GB & SU-A1-648 343 (ceme=cherp metal wks), & SU648343 A 00000000 |