EP0558599 - A DEVICE FOR INDICATING BRAKE LINING WEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states AB VOLVO Assar Gabrielssons väg, Torslanda S-405 08 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGERFORS, Dan Nolas Andersvägen 21 S-448 31 Floda / SE | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92900323.4 | 28.11.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991SE00812 | Priority number, date | SE19900003791 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: SE 9003791 | [1993/36] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209822 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558599 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558599 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02, // F16D65/56 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
F16D66/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DES VERSCHLEISSES VON BREMSBELAG | [1993/36] | English: | A DEVICE FOR INDICATING BRAKE LINING WEAR | [1993/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF INDIQUANT L'USURE DES GARNITURES DE FREIN | [1993/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1992 | Translation filed | 25.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1996 | BE | 17.04.1996 | ES | 17.04.1996 | NL | 17.04.1996 | SE | 17.07.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
ES | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
BE | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 17.07.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3388773 (QUINN CLARK E); | [A]DE1600223 (WESTINGHOUSE BREMSEN APPARATE); | [A]DE2053592 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]US4013143 (JUHASZ JOHN EMIL); | [X]US4015693 (HAYASHIDA YOSHIHIRO, et al); | [A]US4396097 (BAYLISS JOHN P [GB]); | [A]EP0093657 (DBA SA [FR]); | [XA]EP0251848 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE EQUIP [FR], et al) |