EP0524271 - LOAD-LIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heppenstall Holding AG Gewerbestrasse 5 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1993/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGARTNER, Guido Mattweg 8 CH-6037 Root / CH | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Wann Patentanwaltsbüro Zwängiweg 7 CH-8038 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92900406.7 | 16.12.1991 | [1993/04] | WO1991CH00269 | Priority number, date | CH19910000396 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: CH 39691 | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213792 | Date: | 20.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524271 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524271 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/04, B66C1/28 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B66C1/28 (EP,US);
B66C1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/04] | Title | German: | LASTHEBEVORRICHTUNG | [1993/04] | English: | LOAD-LIFTING DEVICE | [1993/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE DE CHARGE | [1993/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.08.1995 | [2002/25] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3112348 (EISENBAU ESSEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE174642 ; | [A]DE2426359 (DEMAG AG); | [A]DE290886 ; | [A]US3606056 (MORGAN HOWARD); | [A]DE1289640 (WILHELM SCHEIDT KG MASCHINENFA) |