EP0514552 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTIC FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YUASA CORPORATION 6-6, Josai-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states YUASA CORPORATION 6-6, Josai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | ||
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states YUASA BATTERY CO., LTD. 6-6, Johsai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUYAMA, Ryoichi Yuasa Battery Co., Ltd., 6-6, Josai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Eiichi Yuasa Battery Co., Ltd., 6-6, Josai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Linn, Samuel Jonathan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/48] | Barker, Rosemary Anne MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92900502.3 | 09.12.1991 | [1992/48] | WO1991JP01701 | Priority number, date | JP19900409997 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40999790 | JP19900410959 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41095990 | JP19900411402 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41140290 | JP19900412014 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41201490 | JP19910029539 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: JP 2953991 | JP19910029540 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: JP 2954091 | JP19910044367 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4436791 | JP19910059368 | 28.02.1991 Original published format: JP 5936891 | JP19910059369 | 28.02.1991 Original published format: JP 5936991 | JP19910072352 | 11.03.1991 Original published format: JP 7235291 | JP19910083260 | 23.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8326091 | JP19910083261 | 23.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8326191 | JP19910208684 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20868491 | JP19910208685 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20868591 | JP19910240466 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: JP 24046691 | JP19910270055 | 20.09.1991 Original published format: JP 27005591 | JP19910284031 | 03.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28403191 | JP19910289148 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28914891 | [1992/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210862 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514552 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514552 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/12 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/1233 (EP,US);
H01M8/1231 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/50] |
Former [1992/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ELEKTROLYTISCHER FESTSTOFFZELLE | [1992/48] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTIC FUEL CELL | [1992/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ELECTROLYTIQUE A L'ETAT SOLIDE | [1992/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.1992 | Translation filed | 31.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 31.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01110904 ; | [A]FR1375469 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE); | [A]DE1179852 (ZIRCONIUM CORP OF AMERICA); | [A]US4957673 (SCHROEDER JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US3377203 (HANS-HEINRICH MOBIUS, et al); | [A]EP0134136 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 334 (M-855)(3682) 27 July 1989 & JP-A-01 110 904 ( ISUZU MOTORS LTD ) 27 April 1989, & JP01110904 A 19890427 | International search | [Y]JPH0193065 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPS62268063 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [P]JPH0381972 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [P]JPH03101065 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPS4976038 ; | [Y]JPS647475 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPS61216258 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) |