|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.04.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
New French translation of the claims |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.04.2007 |
New German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
05.04.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.02.2006 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2005 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.09.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
60 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
38 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
67 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
80 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
11.04.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
92 |
|
08.07.1992 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Notification of designations |
Search / examination |
1 |