EP0563093 - A COMPOSITION USED AS A THERAPEUTIC AGENT AGAINST CHRONIC VIRAL HEPATIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDEVA HOLDINGS B.V. Churchill-Laan 223 1078 ED Amsterdam / NL | [2007/40] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states MEDEVA HOLDINGS B.V. Churchilllaan 223 1078 ED Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states MEDEVA HOLDINGS BV Churchill-laan 223 NL-1078 ED Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMA, Hans, A. Giselastrasse 3 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1998/35] |
Former [1993/40] | 01 /
THOMA, Hans, A. Giselastra e 3 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1993/40] | Holmes, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92900527.0 | 19.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991EP02460 | Priority number, date | EP19900124775 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: EP 90124775 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211368 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563093 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563093 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0563093 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/29 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | C12N15/33, C12N15/36, A61K39/12, A61K39/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VERWENDBAR ALS THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL GEGEN CHRONISCHE VIRALE LEBERKRANKHEITEN | [1993/40] | English: | A COMPOSITION USED AS A THERAPEUTIC AGENT AGAINST CHRONIC VIRAL HEPATIC DISEASES | [1993/40] | French: | COMPOSITION UTILISEE COMME AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE CONTRE DES MALADIES HEPATIQUES VIRALES CHRONIQUES | [1993/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 01.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1999 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
08.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA 89 rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Privett, Kathryn Louise GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1999
08.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE SmithKline Beecham Biologicals SA 89 rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE Opponent's representative Privett, Kathryn Louise SmithKline Beecham plc, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court - 2/NHC/1, Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | 01.07.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.04.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.03.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.04.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.09.2003 | Appeal received No. T0973/03 | 14.11.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.03.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0175261 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [X]EP0243913 (NEW YORK BLOOD CENTER INC [US], et al); | [X]EP0250253 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]); | [X]EP0271302 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]); | [X]WO8810300 (MEDICO LABS AG [CH]); | [X]EP0385610 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) |