EP0561927 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF B-CELL MALIGNANCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHERING-PLOUGH 92, rue Baudin 92307 Levallois-Perret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states SCHERING-PLOUGH 92, rue Baudin F-92307 Levallois-Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANCHEREAU, Jacques 25, avenue Paul-Santy F-69130 Ecully / FR | 02 /
DE FRANCE, Thierry Charrière Blanche, Bât. Charme Chemin de Charrière, F-69130 Ecully / FR | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92901009.8 | 10.12.1991 | [1993/39] | WO1991EP02380 | Priority number, date | EP19900403585 | 13.12.1990 Original published format: EP 90403585 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210201 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561927 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561927 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/2026 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/39] | A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/45] |
Former [1993/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON B-ZELL-ENTARTUNGEN | [1993/39] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF B-CELL MALIGNANCIES | [1993/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DES AFFECTIONS MALIGNES A LYMPHOCYTES B | [1993/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - Blood, volume 75, no. 5, 1 March 1990, Saunders Comp., (Duluth, US) C.W. Taylor et al.: "Effects of interleukin-4 on the in vitro growth of human lymphoid and plasma cel neoplasms", pages 1114-1118, see especially page 1117, table 3 and left-hand column, line 3 - right-hand column, line 13 | [X] - The Journal of Experimental Medicine, volume 168, no. 1, 1 July 1988, Rockefeller University Press (New York, US) S. Karray et al.: "Interleukin 4 counteracts the interleukin 2-induced proliferation of monoclonal B cells", pages 85-94, see pages 85-94 (cited in the application) |