Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] |
25.01.1994 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] |
27.08.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] |
27.08.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] |