Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06506158 | Global Dossier | 14.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9108781 | 22.11.1991 | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU647862B | Global Dossier | 31.03.1994 | B2 | AU9100991 | 22.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US9108781 | 22.11.1991 | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9211437 | Global Dossier | 09.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0564506 | Global Dossier | 16.03.1994 | A4 | EP0564506 | 13.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9105592 | 01.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2097065 | 20.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5131481 | 21.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA919683 | 28.04.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | US63014790 | 19.12.1990 |