EP0564506 - INSERT HAVING A SURFACE OF CARBIDE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Emlyn, N. R.D. 4, Box 25 Ligonier, PA 15658 / US | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92901502.2 | 22.11.1991 | [1993/41] | WO1991US08781 | Priority number, date | US19900630147 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: US 630147 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211437 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564506 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/56 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
E21B10/56 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1993/41] | Title | German: | EINSATZ MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHE AUS HARTMETALLTEILCHEN | [1993/41] | English: | INSERT HAVING A SURFACE OF CARBIDE PARTICLES | [1993/41] | French: | ELEMENT RAPPORTE AVEC SURFACE COMPOSEE DE PARTICULES DE CARBURE | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 09.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 04.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]IT679193 ; | [Y]US2846193 (JACK CHADDERDON); | [Y]GB947440 (JERSEY PROD RES CO); | [Y]US4109737 (BOVENKERK HAROLD P); | [A]US4940099 (DEANE JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]FR2504589 (VENNIN HENRI [FR]); | [A]US4570726 (HALL DAVID R [US]); | [A]US4705124 (ABRAHAMSON GERALD R [US], et al); | [A]US4696352 (BULJAN SERGEJ-TOMISLAV [US], et al); | [AP]US4984940 (BRYANT WILLIAM A [US], et al) |