EP0563159 - AIR/OIL MIXTURE AS A LUBRICANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAVY McKEE (SHEFFIELD) LIMITED Prince of Wales Road Sheffield S9 4EX Yorkshire / GB | For all designated states DENCO LIMITED P.O. Box 11, Holmer Road Hereford Herfordshire HR4 9SJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states DAVY McKEE (SHEFFIELD) LIMITED Prince of Wales Road Sheffield S9 4EX Yorkshire / GB | ||
For all designated states DENCO LIMITED P.O. Box 11, Holmer Road Hereford, Herfordshire HR4 9SJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRATTAN, Esmond 46 Chapefield Way, Thorpe Hesley Rotherham, Yorkshire S61 2Tl / GB | 02 /
MACKLIN, David Greenwalls, Bishopstone, Hereford Herefordshire HR4 7HX / GB | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92901515.4 | 17.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991GB02258 | Priority number, date | GB19900027478 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9027478 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211490 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563159 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563159 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/32, F16N25/02, F16N27/00 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
F16N27/00 (EP,US);
F16N25/02 (EP,US);
F16N7/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | ÖLNEBEL ALS SCHMIERMITTEL | [1993/40] | English: | AIR/OIL MIXTURE AS A LUBRICANT | [1993/40] | French: | MELANGE AIR/HUILE SERVANT DE LUBRIFIANT | [1993/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB831928 (ALFRED REYNOULDS SCHLOSSHAUER); | [Y]DE2435018 (SAFEMATIC LTD OY) |