EP0564507 - INTERLOCKABLE STRUCTURAL MEMBERS AND FOLDABLE DOUBLE WALL CONTAINERS ASSEMBLED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASE DESIGNERS CORPORATION 6376 Village Center Drive Suite 207 Bealton, VA 22712-9316 / US | [1993/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHENICIE, Ronald, W. 83 Echols Court Warrenton, VA 22186 / US | 02 /
DAHLQUIST, Peter, E. 83 Echols Court Warrenton, VA 22186 / US | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Hoormann, Walter R., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Hoormann, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92901526.1 | 25.10.1991 | [1993/41] | WO1991US07851 | Priority number, date | US19910637542 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: US 637542 | US19910688255 | 22.04.1991 Original published format: US 688255 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9212074 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564507 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/02, E04C2/08, B62D33/04 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
B65D90/08 (EP,US);
B65D90/026 (EP,US);
E04C2/40 (EP,US);
F16B5/0056 (EP,US);
Y10T428/19 (EP,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | GEGENSEITIGE VERRIEGELBARE/BAUTEILE UND MIT DIESEN ZUSAMMENGEBAUTE FALTBARE DOPPELWANDIGE CONTAINER | [1993/41] | English: | INTERLOCKABLE STRUCTURAL MEMBERS AND FOLDABLE DOUBLE WALL CONTAINERS ASSEMBLED THEREFROM | [1993/41] | French: | ELEMENTS PORTEURS POUVANT ETRE RECIPROQUEMENT VERROUILLES ET CONTENEURS PLIABLES A DOUBLE PAROI CONSTRUITS A PARTIR DE CES ELEMENTS | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/25] | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH541046 (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]GB966751 (REYNOLDS METALS CO); | [A]CH556500 (MUENCHENSTEIN ALUMINIUM PRESS); | [A]GB813143 (ERNST J DE RIDDER); | [A]EP0119668 (SMIT JAQUES WILLEM); | [A]DE1480643 ; | [A]EP0341729 (GRAAFF KG [DE]) |