EP0519082 - METHOD OF TEACHING PALLETIZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Atsushi, R 7-207, Fanuc Manshonharimori 3539-1 Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yanasshi 401-05 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Takayuki Fanuc Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1 Shinokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | 03 /
NISHI, Makoto Fanuc Dai-2 Vira-karamatsu 3528, Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92901874.5 | 26.12.1991 | [1992/52] | WO1991JP01776 | Priority number, date | JP19900414576 | 27.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41457690 | [1992/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212470 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519082 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, G05B19/403, G05B19/42 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B25J9/1669 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/52] | G05B19/403, G05B19/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINLERNEN EINER PALLETISIERUNG | [1992/52] | English: | METHOD OF TEACHING PALLETIZING | [1992/52] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPRENTISSAGE DE LA PALETTISATION | [1992/52] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1992 | Translation filed | 16.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 16.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/29] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP02178810 ; | [Y]JP01295771 ; | [A]JP01171788 ; | [A]JP63123723 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 440 (P-1111)26 September 1990 & JP-A-02 178 810 ( FANUC LTD. ) 11 July 1990, & JP02178810 A 19900711 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 81 (M-935)15 February 1990 & JP-A-01 295 771 ( MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP. ) 29 November 1989, & JP01295771 A 19891129 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 446 (M-877)6 October 1989 & JP-A-01 171 788 ( SHIBAURA ENG. WORKS CO. LTD. ) 6 July 1989, & JP01171788 A 19890706 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 374 (M-749)6 October 1988 & JP-A-63 123 723 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 27 May 1988, & JP63123723 A 19880527 | International search | [Y]JPS6472205 ; | [Y]JPS6126109 |