EP0585224 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES WHICH BIND TO SECRETED AND MEMBRANE-BOUND IgE, BUT NOT TO IgE ON BASOPHILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANOX BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 10301 Stella Link, Suite 110 Houston, TX 77025 / US | [1994/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Tse, Wen 3323 Robinhood Houston, TX 77005 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Frances, M. 3310 El Dorado Boulevard Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | 03 /
GOSSETT, Lani, A. 4902 Valerie Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 04 /
SUN, Lee, K. 4212 Villanova Houston, TX 77005 / US | 05 /
SUN, Bill, N., C. 4901 Welford Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 06 /
SUN, Cecily, R., Y. 4901 Welford Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 07 /
LIOU, Ruey, S. 1514 River Bend Crossing Sugarland, TX 77478 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92901974.3 | 26.03.1991 | [1994/10] | WO1991US01991 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217207 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585224 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12P21/08, C12N5/10, A61K47/48 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/4291 (EP);
A61K47/6873 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | A61K39/40, A61K39/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER, DIE AN SEKRETIERTES- UND MEMBRANGEBUNDENES IGE, ABER NICHT AN BASOPHILES-IGE BINDEN | [1994/10] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES WHICH BIND TO SECRETED AND MEMBRANE-BOUND IgE, BUT NOT TO IgE ON BASOPHILS | [1994/10] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX QUI SE LIENT A L'IgE SECRETEE ET LIEE AUX MEMBRANES MAIS QUI NE SE LIENT PAS A L'IgE SE TROUVANT SUR LES LEUCOCYTES BASOPHILES | [1994/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 23.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/17] | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO8906138 (TANOX BIOSYSTEMS, INC.) [DX] 1-6 * claim - *; | [X]EP0396505 (CIBA-GEIGY AG) [X] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]US4940782 (RUP ET AL.) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - L. GOSSETT ET AL., "Reactivity of IgE on FcepsilonRII with various IgE-specific monoclonal antibodies.", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, NEW YORK NY, USA, (198910), vol. 109, no. 4(2), page 164A [A] 1,2 * abstract 899 * | [A] - F. DAVIS ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies that bind to IgE on B cells but not to IgE on high and low affinity IgE receptors.", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, NEW YORK NY, USA, (198910), vol. 109, no. 4(2), page 163A [A] 1,2 * abstract 898 * | [A] - F. DAVIS ET AL., "Two isoforms of membrabe-bound human IgE.", THE FASEB JOURNAL, BETHESDA MD, USA, (19910311), vol. 5, no. 4, page A605 [A] 1,2 * abstract 1362 * | [A] - F. DAVIS ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies specific for the transmembrane anchor peptide og IgE.", THE FASEB JOURNAL, BETHESDA MD, USA, (19900426), vol. 4, no. 7, page A1808 [A] 1-6 * abstract 672 * | [A] - T. CHANG ET AL., "Monoclonal antibodies specific for human IgE-producing B cells: A potential therapeutic for IgE-mediated allergic diseases.", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK NY, USA, (199002), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 122 - 126 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4714759 ; | [A]US4845042 ; | [A]US4865980 ; | [AE]US5017489 ; | [AE]US5026545 ; | [AE]US5053224 |