EP0555403 - COMPUTER DOCUMENTS AS COMPOUND DOCUMENTS IN A NOTEBOOK METAPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GO CORPORATION 950 Tower Lane, Suite 1400 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [1993/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR, Robert 725 Euclid Ave. San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | 02 /
FRAISL, Daniel, J. 21697 Lomita Ave. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
ISAAC, Steve 12 East Court Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
OUYE, Michael 840 Boyce Ave. Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 05 /
VIERRA, Joseph P. 990 Broadway, No. 3 San Francisco, California 94133 / US | [1993/48] |
Former [1993/33] | 01 /
CARR, Robert 725 Euclid Ave. San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | ||
02 /
FRAISL, Daniel, J. 21697 Lomita Ave. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
ISAAC, Steve 12 East Court Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
04 /
OUYE, Michael 840 Boyce Ave. Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC2A 1AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92902035.2 | 29.10.1991 | [1993/33] | WO1991US08077 | Priority number, date | US19900607139 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: US 607139 | [1993/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208199 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555403 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/40, G06F9/44, G06F3/033, G06F3/023 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP);
G06F16/40 (EP);
G06F3/0483 (EP);
G06F40/10 (EP);
G06F40/114 (EP);
G06F40/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/33] | Title | German: | RECHNERDOKUMENTE ALS ZUSAMMENGESETZTE DOKUMENTE IN EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN NOTIZBUCH | [1993/33] | English: | COMPUTER DOCUMENTS AS COMPOUND DOCUMENTS IN A NOTEBOOK METAPHOR | [1993/33] | French: | DOCUMENTS INFORMATIQUES UTILISES COMME DOCUMENTS COMPOSES DANS UN GRAPHISME D'AGENDA | [1993/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/44] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0339220 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | [X] - HP WORLD November 1988, pages 24 - 27; PAUL BRADY: 'Personal productivity using A.I. techniques' | [A] - HP WORLD October 1988, pages 11 - 12; PAUL BRADY: 'New waves of personal productivity' | [A] - ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS vol. 5, no. 2, April 1986, pages 79 - 109; R.W.SCHEIFLER ET AL.: 'The X Window System' cited in the application |