EP0565574 - ARTHROPODICIDAL CARBOXANILIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANNIS, Gary, David 13 Franklin Road Landenburg, PA 19350 / US | 02 /
BARNETTE, William, Eldo 107 Oxford Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 03 /
McCANN, Stephen, Frederick 2012 Christiana Meadows Bear, DE 10701 / US | 04 /
WING, Keith, Dumont 1304 Hillside Boulevard Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92902235.8 | 17.12.1991 | [1993/42] | WO1991US09164 | Priority number, date | US19900632438 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: US 632438 | US19910714401 | 11.06.1991 Original published format: US 714401 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211249 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565574 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565574 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D273/04, C07D253/08, C07D285/16, C07D498/04, C07D413/06, A01N43/88, A01N43/90 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C07D253/10 (EP,US);
A01N47/38 (EP,US);
C07D273/04 (EP,US);
C07D285/16 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | GEGEN ARTHROPODEN WIRKSAME CARBONSÄUREANILIDE | [1993/42] | English: | ARTHROPODICIDAL CARBOXANILIDES | [1993/42] | French: | CARBOXANILIDES ACTIFS CONTRE LES ARTHROPODES | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.1995 | BE | 02.08.1995 | DK | 02.08.1995 | MC | 02.08.1995 | NL | 02.08.1995 | SE | 02.11.1995 | LU | 31.12.1995 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
NL | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
MC | 17.12.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2003/11] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
MC | 02.08.1995 | ||
NL | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
CH | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
LI | 02.08.1995 | ||
MC | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
CH | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
LI | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
CH | 12.10.1995 | ||
LI | 12.10.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
DK | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
BE | 02.08.1995 | ||
SE | 02.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 02.08.1995 | |
SE | 02.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8805046 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0286346 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0363051 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0365201 (DU PONT [US]) |