EP0588793 - HOUSING FOR MOTOR VEHICLE ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | ||
For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIRMER, Klaus Rosmarinweg 4 D-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
BURGDORF, Jochen Neugasse 11 D-6050 Offenbach-Rumpenheim / DE | 03 /
LORECK, Heinz Im Rosenweg 16 D-6270 Idstein 2 / DE | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 92902384.4 | 09.01.1992 | [1994/13] | WO1992EP00027 | Priority number, date | DE19914102265 | 26.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4102265 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212875 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588793 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588793 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H05K7/20 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B60R16/0239 (EP,US);
H05K1/0209 (EP,US);
H05K1/021 (EP,US);
H05K7/20854 (EP,US);
H05K1/182 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09781 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10166 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10446 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10969 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/13] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR KFZ-ELEKTRONIK | [1994/13] | English: | HOUSING FOR MOTOR VEHICLE ELECTRONICS | [1994/13] | French: | BOITIER POUR COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES D'AUTOMOBILE | [1994/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
29.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
29.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
29.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 19.02.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.01.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/38] | 13.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3837974 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3045329 (KOSTAL FA LEOPOLD [DE]); | [A]DE2626328 (CHRYSLER CORP) |