EP0564542 - SUPERCHARGING DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CZ STRAKONICE A.S. Tovarni 202 386 15 Strakonice / CS | [1993/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECNAR, Josef Pancirova 1442/6 140 00 Praha 4 / CS | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/41] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92902387.7 | 27.12.1991 | [1993/41] | WO1991CS00004 | Priority number, date | CS19900006963 | 29.12.1990 Original published format: CS 696390 | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212335 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564542 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564542 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/04, F02B37/00 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
F02B37/04 (EP);
F01N3/055 (EP);
F02B37/004 (EP);
F02B37/013 (EP);
F02B37/164 (EP);
F02B37/166 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/41] | Title | German: | AUFLADUNGSEINRICHTUNG EINER VERBRENNUNGSMASCHINE | [1993/41] | English: | SUPERCHARGING DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1993/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURALIMENTATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.09.1994 | GB | 07.09.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/37] | GB | 07.09.1994 | |
FR | 03.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | FR | 03.02.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60212621 ; | [A]DE1231951 (BRITISH INTERNAL COMBUST ENG); | [A]US2620621 (FREDERICK NETTEL); | [A]FR1406599 (HISPANO SUIZA SA); | [A]DE701457 (RHEINMETALL BORSIG AG); | [A]FR2226559 (FIAT SPA [IT]); | [A]US2306277 (HANS OSWALD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 66 (M-461)(2123) 15. März 1986 & JP,A,60 212 621 ( ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO K.K. ) 24. Oktober 1985, & JP60212621 A 00000000 |