EP0522108 - CONSUMABLE ANODE WITH WEAR INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/02] | WEAR INDICATOR FOR CONSUMABLE ANODES | ||
[1995/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stiebel Eltron GmbH & Co. KG Dr.-Stiebel Strasse 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states STIEBEL ELTRON GmbH & Co. KG Dr.-Stiebel Strasse D-37603 Holzminden / DE | ||
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states Hössle, Sibylle Kruckenbergstrasse 6 D-12107 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖSSLE, Ludwig Kruckenbergstrasse 6 D-1000 Berlin 42 / DE | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Hartmut Handjerystrasse 20 12159 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Scholz, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Rheinstrasse 64 D-12159 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 92902421.4 | 31.12.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991DE01019 | Priority number, date | DE19904042312 | 31.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4042312 | DE19910004100U | 30.03.1991 Original published format: DE 9104100 U | DE19914117781 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4117781 | DE19914124930 | 25.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4124930 | DE19910013267U | 22.10.1991 Original published format: DE 9113267 U | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212277 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522108 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522108 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23F13/22 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C23F13/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | OPFERANODE MIT VERBRAUCHSANZEIGE | [1995/47] | English: | CONSUMABLE ANODE WITH WEAR INDICATOR | [1995/47] | French: | ANODE REACTIVE AVEC INDICATEUR DE COMSOMMATION | [1995/47] |
Former [1993/02] | VERBRAUCHSANZEIGE FÜR OPFERANODEN | ||
Former [1993/02] | WEAR INDICATOR FOR CONSUMABLE ANODES | ||
Former [1993/02] | INDICATEUR DE CONSOMMATION POUR ANODES REACTIVES | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 22.11.1995 | ES | 22.11.1995 | GB | 22.11.1995 | NL | 22.11.1995 | SE | 22.02.1996 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/25] | DK | 22.11.1995 | |
ES | 22.11.1995 | ||
GB | 22.11.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/27] | DK | 22.11.1995 | |
GB | 22.11.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 22.11.1995 | |
GB | 22.11.1995 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | GB | 22.11.1995 | |
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 22.02.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2658707 (HOESSLE LUDWIG); | [A]DE3007857 (HOESSLE LUDWIG) |