EP0561998 - THE REMOVAL OF HEAVY METALS, ESPECIALLY LEAD, FROM AQUEOUS SYSTEMS CONTAINING COMPETING IONS UTILIZING AMORPHOUS TIN AND TITANIUM SILICATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin, New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLENN, W., Dodwell 20 Pionner Drive Tinton Falls, NJ 07753 / US | 02 /
SMITH, BethAnn 614 South Laurel Avenue Hszlet, NJ 07730 / US | [1993/45] |
Former [1993/39] | 01 /
GLENN, W., Dodwell 20 Pionner Drive Tinton Falls, NJ 07753 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, BethAnn 307 Forest Haven Blvd. Edison, JN 08817 / US | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92902570.8 | 17.07.1991 | [1993/39] | WO1991US05027 | Priority number, date | US19900625731 | 04.12.1990 Original published format: US 625731 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210292 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561998 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561998 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/14, C02F1/28 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
C01B33/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01J39/14 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/28 (KR);
C22B3/42 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S210/912 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNG VON SCHWEREN METALLEN, INSBESONDERE BLEI, AUS WÄSSERIGEN, KONKURRIERENDE IONEN ENTHALTENDEN MEDIEN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON AMORPHEN ZINN- UND TITANIUMSILIKATEN | [1993/39] | English: | THE REMOVAL OF HEAVY METALS, ESPECIALLY LEAD, FROM AQUEOUS SYSTEMS CONTAINING COMPETING IONS UTILIZING AMORPHOUS TIN AND TITANIUM SILICATES | [1993/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DES METAUX LOURDS, PLUS PARTICULIEREMENT DU PLOMB, SE TROUVANT DANS DES SYSTEMES AQUEUX RENFERMANT DES IONS CONCURRENTS, A L'AIDE DE SILICATES DE TITANE ET D'ETAIN AMORPHES | [1993/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1998 | BE | 09.09.1998 | CH | 09.09.1998 | ES | 09.09.1998 | FR | 09.09.1998 | GR | 09.09.1998 | IT | 09.09.1998 | LI | 09.09.1998 | NL | 09.09.1998 | DK | 09.12.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
FR | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
DK | 09.12.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
DK | 09.12.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
NL | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
ES | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
GR | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
CH | 09.09.1998 | ||
LI | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
CH | 14.12.1998 | ||
LI | 14.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
BE | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 09.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1584716 (BEHRMAN ABRAHAM S); | [A]US2165578 (WAYNE REMBERT ERNEST); | [A]EP0372132 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) | [A] - INDIAN JOURNAL OF TECHNOL. vol. 16, no. 5, May 1978, NEW DELHI pages 204 - 206; & D BAXI: 'ION-EXCHANGE PROPERTIES OF TITANIUM SILICATES' see page 204 - page 206 | [A] - INDIAN JOURNAL OF TECHNOL. vol. 16, no. 5, May 1978, NEW DEHLI pages 201 - 203; & D. BAXI: 'PREPARATION AND ION-EXCHANGE PROPERTIES OF TIN SILICATES' see page 201 - page 203 |