EP0554409 - OLIGO(2-ALKENYL AZLACTONES) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEILMANN, Steven, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MOREN, Dean, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
RASMUSSEN, Jerald, K. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
KREPSKI, Larry, R. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
PATHRE, Sadanand, V. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [1995/48] |
Former [1993/32] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92902578.1 | 16.09.1991 | [1993/32] | WO1991US06644 | Priority number, date | US19900602100 | 23.10.1990 Original published format: US 602100 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207012 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554409 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554409 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F26/06, C08F126/06, C07D263/42 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C07D263/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D498/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/06] |
Former [1993/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | OLIGO(2-ALKENYL-AZLACTONE) | [1993/32] | English: | OLIGO(2-ALKENYL AZLACTONES) | [1993/32] | French: | OLIGO(2-ALCENYLE AZLACTONES) | [1993/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 18.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 24.05.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, GR, LU | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1770454 (ROEHM GMBH); | [Y]EP0105665 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [Y] - POLYMER JOURNAL. vol. 12, no. 9, 1980, TOKYO JP pages 661 - 675; D. A. TOMALIA ET AL.: 'Ionic oligomerization and polymerisation of 2-alkenyl -2-oxazolines' cited in the application |