EP0560922 - MATRIX COMPOSITES IN WHICH THE MATRIX CONTAINS POLYBENZOXAZOLE OR POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERINI, Peter, E. 2262 Ashby Avenue Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 02 /
WESSLING, Ritchie, A. 1126 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | 03 /
KIM, Peter, K. 48 White Pine Lane Danville, CA 94506 / US | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann, Dr. H.-G. Sternagel, Dr. H. Dörries, Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 92902608.6 | 06.12.1991 | [1993/38] | WO1991US09229 | Priority number, date | US19900624164 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: US 624164 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210364 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560922 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, C08J5/04, C08L79/04, C08L81/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C08J5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B32B5/26 (KR);
B32B9/00 (KR);
C08J2379/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2381/00 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/38] | B32B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | MATRIX-VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE IN DENEN DIE MATRIX POLYBENZOXAZOLE ODER POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE ENTHALT | [1993/38] | English: | MATRIX COMPOSITES IN WHICH THE MATRIX CONTAINS POLYBENZOXAZOLE OR POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE | [1993/38] | French: | MATRICES COMPOSITES DANS LESQUELLES LA MATRICE CONTIENT DU POLYBENZOXAZOLE OU POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE | [1993/38] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 14.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4533693 (WOLFE JAMES F [US], et al); | [A]US4963428 (HARVEY ANDREW C [US], et al); | [YP]US4996281 (SO YING H [US]) |