EP0567506 - IMPROVEMENTS TO HIGH TEMPERATURE SECONDARY BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/44] | HIGH TEMPERATURE SECONDARY BATTERIES | ||
[1996/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London WC1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, Whitehall London WC1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, John Bradley DRA Maritime Div., Fort Road AAlverstoke, Hampshire PO12 2DU / GB | 02 /
MOORE, David Roy DRA Maritime Div., Holton Heath Poole Dorset BH16 6JU / GB | 03 /
PEARCE, Leonard John DRA Maritime Div., HoltonHeanth Poole, Dorset BH16 6JU / GB | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92902825.6 | 14.01.1992 | [1993/44] | WO1992GB00076 | Priority number, date | GB19910000936 | 16.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100936 | [1993/46] |
Former [1993/44] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213366 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567506 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567506 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/39 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/399 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/44] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN HOCHTEMPERATUR-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN | [1996/41] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO HIGH TEMPERATURE SECONDARY BATTERIES | [1996/41] | French: | AMELIORATION A ACCUMULATEURS A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [1996/41] |
Former [1993/44] | HOCHTEMPERATUR-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN | ||
Former [1993/44] | HIGH TEMPERATURE SECONDARY BATTERIES | ||
Former [1993/44] | ACCUMULATEURS A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3907589 (GAY EDDIE C, et al); | [X]US4324846 (KAUN THOMAS D, et al); | [X]US4446212 (KAUN THOMAS D [US]); | [Y]US4851306 (KAUN THOMAS D [US], et al); | [A]US4189529 (BIRT DENIS C P [GB], et al); | [A]US4011372 (TOMCZUK ZYGMUNT, et al) |