EP0570402 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR TIME/VOLTAGE CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Michael Freiersbach 3 D-7605 Bad Peterstal-Griesbach / DE | 02 /
BENOIT, Eric Wasenstr. 5 W-7750 Schwenningen / DE | [1993/47] | Application number, filing date | 92903547.5 | 01.02.1992 | [1993/47] | WO1992EP00219 | Priority number, date | DE19914103813 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4103813 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214303 | Date: | 20.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570402 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570402 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K9/08 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
H03K9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] |
Former [1993/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | ||
Former [1993/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZEIT/SPANNUNGS-WANDLUNG | [1993/47] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR TIME/VOLTAGE CONVERSION | [1993/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION TEMPS/TENSION | [1993/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/24: Verbunden mit 92200361.1/0498514 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 22.04.96 | EPB 1996/24: Consolidated with 92200361.1/0498514 (European application no./publication no.) by decision dated 22.04.96 | EPB 1996/24: Jointe à la demande no. 92200361.1/0498514 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 22.04.96 | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.07.1997 | SE | 09.10.1997 | PT | 07.11.1997 | AT | 01.02.1998 | BE | 28.02.1998 | CH | 28.02.1998 | LI | 28.02.1998 | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 09.07.1997 | |
SE | 09.10.1997 | ||
PT | 07.11.1997 | ||
AT | 01.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | SE | 09.10.1997 | |
PT | 07.11.1997 | ||
AT | 01.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | SE | 09.10.1997 | |
PT | 07.11.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/24] | SE | 09.10.1997 | |
PT | 07.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 09.10.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP57048826 ; | [A]JP2264295 ; | [Y]GB1397411 (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [A]US4716398 (ECCLESTON LARRY E [US], et al); | [AP]EP0417578 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - NTIS TECH NOTES. Nr. 3B, März 1986, SPRINGFIELD, VA US Seite 282; G. SOSACK ET AL.: 'Pulse-Width-to-Analog-Voltage Converter' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 119 (E-116)(997) 3. Juli 1982 & JP,A,57 048 826 ( NIPPON DENKI KIKI K.K. ) 20. März 1982, & JP57048826 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 20 (P-1154)17. Januar 1991 & JP,A,2 264 295 ( SHARP CORP ) 29. Oktober 1990, & JP2264295 A 00000000 |