15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
30.08.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
18.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
17.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
12.05.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
24.03.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] |
25.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.04.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
16.04.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
16.04.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
09.04.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] |
19.03.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] |
10.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
05.02.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
15.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.11.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
19.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.11.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
14.11.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
07.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.11.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
20.09.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
24.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.01.1997 |
First examination report |
|
15.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
06.10.1993 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |
20.08.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] |
20.08.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] |