Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06504057 | Global Dossier | 12.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US9109645 | 19.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU656550B | Global Dossier | 09.02.1995 | B2 | AU9165391 | 22.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US9109645 | 19.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0563301 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2000 | B1 | EP0563301 | 24.11.1993 | A4 | EP0563301 | 06.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US9109645 | 19.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE192644T | 15.05.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US9109645 | 19.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69132191T | 14.12.2000 | T2 | DE69132191D1 | 15.06.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US9109645 | 19.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5143925 | 01.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | US79432191 | 12.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9211007 | Global Dossier | 09.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2098102 | 05.11.1996 | C | CA2098102 | 20.06.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2145005T | 01.07.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US63212690 | 20.12.1990 |