EP0563301 - Cosmetic Process of Reducing the Rate of Mammalian Hair Growth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/40] | ALTERATION OF RATE AND CHARACTER OF HAIR GROWTH | ||
[1999/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | ||
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states HANDELMAN, Joseph H. 26 West 61 Street New York, NY 10023 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDELMAN, Joseph, H. 26 West 61 Street New York, NY 10023 / US | 02 /
SHANDER, Douglas 16112 Howard Landing Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 03 /
FUNKHOUSER, Margaret, G. 1332 South Pollard Street Arlington, VA 2204 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92903695.2 | 19.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991US09645 | Priority number, date | US19900632126 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 632126 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211007 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563301 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563301 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K31/42 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A61Q7/02 (EP);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K8/49 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61K2800/782 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | A61K31/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Verfahren zur Verringerung der Haarwuchsrate bei Säugetieren | [1999/18] | English: | Cosmetic Process of Reducing the Rate of Mammalian Hair Growth | [1999/18] | French: | Procédé cosmétique pour la réduction du taux de croissance des poils chez les mammifères | [1999/21] |
Former [1993/40] | ÄNDERUNG DER RATE UND DES CHARAKTERS DES HAARWACHSTUMS | ||
Former [1993/40] | ALTERATION OF RATE AND CHARACTER OF HAIR GROWTH | ||
Former [1993/40] | MODIFICATION DE LA VITESSE ET DU CARACTERE DE CROISSANCE DU POIL | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Request for further processing for: | 04.02.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.1999 | Decision despatched | 05.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 20.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2000 | BE | 10.05.2000 | CH | 10.05.2000 | GR | 10.05.2000 | LI | 10.05.2000 | NL | 10.05.2000 | DK | 10.08.2000 | SE | 10.08.2000 | LU | 19.12.2000 | MC | 31.12.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
GR | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
DK | 10.08.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
NL | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
CH | 10.05.2000 | ||
LI | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | ||
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 10.05.2000 | |
BE | 10.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4720489 (SHANDER DOUGLAS [US]); | [A]US4912120 (CASTELHANO ARLINDO L [CA], et al) | [Y] - HATTORI, M. et al., "Biochemical Analysis of Hair Growth From the Aspects of Aging and Enzyme Activities", J. Derm. 10(1): 45-54. (1983). | [Y] - MARTINET, N. et al., "Epidermal and Hair Follicle Transglutaminases", J. Biol. chem. 263(9): 4236-41. (1988). | [Y] - OGAWA H. et al., "Regulation Mechanisms of Hair Growth", Curr. Prob. Derm." (Norm. Abnorm. Epiderm. Diff.): 159-70 (1983) Abstract. | [Y] - GOLDSMITH, L. A., "Hair Follicle Transglutaminases and the Formation of -( -glutamyl) Cross-links", Hair Research. Springer-Verlag 1981, pp 29-34. | [Y] - CHUNG, S.I. et al., "Transglutaminase from Hair Follicle of Guinea Pig", Proc. Natl. Sci., USA 69(2): 303-307 (1972). | [Y] - KILLACKY, J.J.F. et al., "A New Class of Mechanism-Based Inhibitors of Transglutaminase Enzymes Inhibits the Formation of Cross-Linked Envelopes By Human Malignant Keratinocytes", Mol. Pharmacol. 35: 701-706 (1989). | [A] - HARDING, H.W.J. et al., "Formation of the -( -Glutamyl) lysine Cross-Link in Hair Proteins. Investigation of Transamindases in Hair Follicles", Biochem 11(15): 2858-63 (1972). | [A] - PETERSON, L.L. et al., "Rat Hair Eollicle and Epidermal Transglutaminases Biochemical and Immunochemical Isoenzymes" Biochim. Biophys Acta 657: 268-76 (1981). | [A] - OGAWA H. et al., "Human Epidermal Transglutaminase", J. Invest. Derm. 68: 32-35 (1977). |