EP0522132 - MEMORYLESS ELECTRONIC CAMERA WITH DIRECT HARD COPY OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Cynthia, Sue 18 Westover Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/02] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92903982.4 | 19.12.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991US09521 | Priority number, date | US19900632580 | 24.12.1990 Original published format: US 632580 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211731 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522132 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46, H04N1/00, H04N5/225, G03B17/53, G03B19/02 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
H04N1/00286 (EP);
H04N1/40093 (EP);
H04N23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/02] | Title | German: | SPEICHERLOSES ELEKTRONISCHES KAMERAGERÄT MIT BILDAUSGABETEIL ZUR DIREKTEN HERSTELLUNG VON HARTKOPIEN | [1993/02] | English: | MEMORYLESS ELECTRONIC CAMERA WITH DIRECT HARD COPY OUTPUT | [1993/02] | French: | APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE ELECTRONIQUE SANS MEMOIRE A SORTIE DIRECTE SUR SUPPORT PAPIER | [1993/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 17.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4161749 (ERLICHMAN IRVING [US]); | [Y]US4262301 (ERLICHMAN IRVING); | [A]WO8705716 (BRYNA PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US4827347 (BELL CYNTHIA S [US]); | [A]US4837628 (SASAKI MINORU [JP]); | [A]US4937676 (FINELLI PATRICK L [US], et al); | [X]US4942477 (NAKAMURA SHINYA [JP]) | [Y] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol 11, No 20, E472, abstract of JP 61-189785publ 1986-08-23 |