EP0609210 - OPTICALLY ACTIVE 5H-PYRROLO[3,4-b]PYRAZINE DERIVATIVE, ITS PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | ||
[N/P] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTREL, Claude 17, avenue du Docteur-Arnold-Netter F-75012 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
ROUSSEL, Gérard 20 ter, rue des Carrières F-91450 Soisy-sur-Seine / FR | |||
[1994/32] | |||
Representative(s) | Pilard, Jacques RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. Direction Brevets 20 avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cédex / FR | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 92903994.9 | 16.01.1992 | |
[1994/32] | |||
WO1992FR00031 | |||
Priority number, date | FR19910000490 | 17.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100490 | |
[1994/32] | |||
Filing language | FR | ||
Procedural language | FR | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO9212980 | ||
Date: | 06.08.1992 | ||
Language: | FR | ||
[1992/21] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP0609210 | ||
Date: | 10.08.1994 | ||
Language: | FR | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[1994/32] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP0609210 | ||
Date: | 12.04.1995 | ||
Language: | FR | ||
[1995/15] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1992 |
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1993 | |
Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07B57/00, A61K31/50, // (C07D487/04, 241:00, 209:00) | [1994/32] |
CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/38] | ||
Title | German: | OPTISCH AKTIVES 5H-PYRROLO[3,4-b]PYRAZINDERIVAT, SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN DIE ES ENTHALTEN | [1995/15] |
English: | OPTICALLY ACTIVE 5H-PYRROLO[3,4-b]PYRAZINE DERIVATIVE, ITS PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING IT | [1995/15] | |
French: | DERIVE DE LA 5H-PYRROLO[3,4-b]PYRAZINE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF, SA PREPARATION ET LES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES QUI LE CONTIENNENT | [1995/15] | |
Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/39: Verbunden mit 92400111.8/0495717 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 11.08.94 | ||
EPB 1994/39: Consolidated with 92400111.8/0495717 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 11.08.94 | |||
EPB 1994/39: Jointe à la demande no. 92400111.8/0495717 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 11.08.94 | |||
Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | |
20.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
13.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 16.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | |
13.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/32] | ||
16.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | ||
14.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
11.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | ||
11.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Cited in | International search | [A]DE2300491 (RHONE POULENC SA); | |
[A]US4220646 (COTREL CLAUDE [FR], et al) |