EP0527976 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SMALL QUANTIFIES OF POWDERED OR GRANULAR SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOHLER, Lorenz Rüttenenweg 61 CH-4313 Möhlin / CH | [1993/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Schwabe, Hans-Georg Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Schwabe, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92904003.8 | 19.02.1992 | [1993/08] | WO1992CH00032 | Priority number, date | CH19910000749 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: CH 74991 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215275 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527976 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527976 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61J11/00, G01F13/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
A61J11/0015 (EP,US);
A61J7/0053 (EP,US);
A61J9/008 (EP,US);
G01F13/001 (EP,US);
A61J17/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | KLEINDOSIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR PULVER- ODER GRANULATFÖRMIGE STOFFE | [1993/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SMALL QUANTIFIES OF POWDERED OR GRANULAR SUBSTANCES | [1993/08] | French: | MICRODOSEUR POUR SUBSTANCES PULVERULENTES OU GRANULEUSES | [1993/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2753067 (CAMILO RODRIGUEZ); | [Y]US2760665 (ZENKER RAYMOND O); | [Y]US3002660 (TAYLOR CLARENCE R); | [Y]US3342318 (RUEKBERG HERBERT S, et al); | [A]DE8223864U ; | [Y]EP0283251 (COOPERS ANIMAL HEALTH [GB]) |