EP0565627 - FUEL SPILLAGE CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRAND, Randolf W. 3.7 Mile Farmer's Loop Road Fairbanks, AK 99708 / US | [1993/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92904207.5 | 07.01.1992 | [1993/42] | WO1992US00235 | Priority number, date | US19910638322 | 07.01.1991 Original published format: US 638322 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212374 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565627 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/00, B65B3/06, B65D90/34, B65D90/24 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
B67D7/3209 (EP,US);
F16L55/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/42] | F16L5/00, B65B3/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | AUFFANGAPPARAT FÜR KRAFTSTOFFÜBERFLUSS | [1993/42] | English: | FUEL SPILLAGE CONTROL APPARATUS | [1993/42] | French: | APPAREIL CAPTANT LE DEBORDEMENT DE FUEL | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/04] | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4854469 (HARGEST THOMAS S [US]); | [Y]US4278115 (BRILES WALLACE E, et al); | [Y]US3739937 (STOCK A); | [A]US4706718 (MILO JOSEPH V [US]); | [A]US4615362 (HARTMAN HARRY B [US], et al); | [A]US4763806 (PODGERS ALEXANDER R [US], et al); | [A]US4593714 (MADDEN MICHAEL J [US]); | [A]US3927702 (INGLE JAMES E, et al); | [A]US4762440 (ARGANDONA TOBY [US]); | [AP]US4486436 (SUNSHINE ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]US1352792 (DAY JOHN L); | [A]US1992151 (LESTER WOODBRIDGE JOSEPH); | [A]US4410100 (SIMMONS JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US4637522 (KLOP ELMER P [US]) | [Y] - Cantainer brochure, Wishahl, Gore & Associates, Fairbanks, AK. |