EP0528041 - NOVEL TRANSITION METAL COMPOUND AND PROCESS FOR POLYMERIZING OLEFIN BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Norihide 2882-2-33, Iijimacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244 / JP | 02 /
SHIOMURA, Tetsunosuke 22-1-304, Yoyogi 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | 03 /
KOUNO, Masahiro 1934, Manazurumachi Ashigara-shimogun, Kanagawa 259-02 / JP | 04 /
SONOBE, Yoshiho 2070-4-33, Iijimacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244 / JP | 05 /
MIZUTANI, Kazumi 2882-3-11, Iijimacho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244 / JP | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92904236.4 | 29.01.1992 | [1993/08] | WO1992JP00080 | Priority number, date | JP19910044682 | 11.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4468291 | [1993/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215596 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528041 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528041 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F10/00, C08F4/64 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F2420/09 (EP);
C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | Uebergangsmetallverbindung und Verfahren zum Polymerisation von Olefin damit | [1993/08] | English: | NOVEL TRANSITION METAL COMPOUND AND PROCESS FOR POLYMERIZING OLEFIN BY USING THE SAME | [1993/08] | French: | NOUVELLE COMPOSITION METALLIQUE DE TRANSITION ET NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION DES OLEFINES A L'AIDE DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [1993/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1992 | Translation filed | 09.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 09.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61130314 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPH0241303 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [A]JPH02274703 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPH02274704 (HOECHST AG) |