EP0572451 - NOVEL STEROID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Aktiebolag 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [1998/14] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states Astra Aktiebolag S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ASTRA S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXELSSON, Bengt Lillegärdsvägen 5 S-240 13 Genarp / SE | 02 /
BRATTSAND, Ralph Skolmästarvgäen 4 S-223 67 Lund / SE | 03 /
KÄLLSTRÖM, Leif Kärrs ngarvägen 39 S-240 17 Södra Sandby / SE | 04 /
THAL N, Arne Morkullevägen 35 S-237 00 Bjärred / SE | [1993/49] | Application number, filing date | 92904423.8 | 29.01.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992SE00056 | Priority number, date | SE19910000342 | 04.02.1991 Original published format: SE 9100342 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213873 | Date: | 20.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572451 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572451 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07J71/00 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C07J71/0031 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | NEUE STEROID-ESTER | [1993/49] | English: | NOVEL STEROID ESTERS | [1993/49] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS STEROIDIQUES | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6067496 ; | [A]US3197469 (JOSEF FRIED); | [A]US3929768 (BRATTSAND RALPH LENNART, et al); | [A]EP0164636 (SICOR SPA [IT]); | [X]EP0170642 (DRACO AB [SE]); | [X]US4695625 (MACDONALD PETER [IT]); | [X] - Thalen Arne, Brattsand Ralph, Gruvstad Eva, "Synthesis and pharmacological properties of some 16x,17x-acetals of 16x-hydroxyhydrocortisone, 16x-hydroxyprednisolone and fluorinated 16x-hydroxyprednisolones", Acta pharmaceutica Suecica, Royal Pharmaceutical Institute, SWEDEN, SWEDEN, (19840101), vol. 21, ISSN 0001-6675, pages 109 - 124, XP008091042 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 009, no. 200, Database accession no. (C - 298), & JP60067496 A 19850417 (OOTA SEIYAKU K.K.) | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 9, No. 200, C298, Abstract of JP,A,60 067 496, publ 1985-04-17 (OOTA SEIYAKU K.K.). |