EP0571458 - FLEXIBLE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgriTay (Holdings) Limited Fowler Road, West Pitkerro Industrial Estate Dundee DD5 3RY / GB | [1995/37] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states SOME GUYS LIMITED Fowler Road, West Pitkerro Industrial Estate Dundee DD5 3RY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALDWELL-NICHOLS, Jeffrey, Robin 3a Charles Avenue Arbroath DD11 2EZ / GB | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904596.1 | 19.02.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992GB00287 | Priority number, date | GB19910003792 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9103792 | GB19910012447 | 10.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9112447 | GB19910015431 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115431 | GB19910019645 | 13.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9119645 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214659 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571458 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571458 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/16 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
B65D88/1618 (EP);
B65D88/1681 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1996/15] |
Former [1993/48] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Flexibler Behälter | [1993/48] | English: | FLEXIBLE CONTAINERS | [1993/48] | French: | RECIPIENT FLEXIBLE | [1993/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.10.1993 | M01   Fee paid on   25.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2136771 ; | [Y]EP0382951 ; | [A]GB2140776 ; | [A]GB1581438 ; | [A]GB2094757 ; | [A]GB2168949 |