EP0533857 - COMBINED PORTABLE ANIMAL WASTE AND TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOOTEN, Richard R. 4403 Homehurst Way West Mitchellville, MD 20716 / US | For all designated states HUGER, Anton L. 6261 Woodchuck Place Waldorf, MD 20603 / US | For all designated states MIDDLETON, Philip N. 3818 Beechdown Drive Chantilly, VA 22021 / US | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 92905025.0 | 22.11.1991 | [1993/13] | WO1991US08574 | Priority number, date | US19910678236 | 01.04.1991 Original published format: US 678236 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217057 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533857 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533857 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01, A01K15/02 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
A01K1/0121 (EP,US);
A01K15/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/13] | A01K1/035 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE EINRICHTUNG ZUR ENTSORGUNG VON HAUSTIERKOT UND ZUR ABRICHTUNG VON TIEREN | [1995/05] | English: | COMBINED PORTABLE ANIMAL WASTE AND TRAINING DEVICE | [1993/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF ASSURANT L'EVACUATION DES EXCREMENTS D'ANIMAUX DOMESTIQUES ET LE DRESSAGE DE CEUX-CI A LA PROPRETE | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/13] | Kombinierte Einrichtung zur Entsorgung von Haustierkot und zur Abrichtung von Tieren | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.1995 | BE | 01.02.1995 | CH | 01.02.1995 | DK | 01.02.1995 | ES | 01.02.1995 | FR | 01.02.1995 | GR | 01.02.1995 | IT | 01.02.1995 | LI | 01.02.1995 | NL | 01.02.1995 | SE | 01.05.1995 | DE | 03.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
BE | 01.02.1995 | ||
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
DK | 01.02.1995 | ||
ES | 01.02.1995 | ||
GR | 01.02.1995 | ||
IT | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
BE | 01.02.1995 | ||
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
DK | 01.02.1995 | ||
GR | 01.02.1995 | ||
IT | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
BE | 01.02.1995 | ||
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
DK | 01.02.1995 | ||
IT | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
BE | 01.02.1995 | ||
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
DK | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
BE | 01.02.1995 | ||
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
DE | 03.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 01.02.1995 | |
CH | 01.02.1995 | ||
LI | 01.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 01.02.1995 | |
LI | 01.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US5027451 (WOOTEN RICHARD R [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3601093 (COHEN FLORAINE); | [A]US3603290 (O'RORK DAVID B); | [A]US4011836 (TEMEL FRANKLIN); | [A]US4231321 (COHEN FLORAINE) |