EP0566693 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING BLENDS OF POLYESTERS AND ACRYLIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | ||
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Mahendra, Kumar 2600 Brighton Court Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/43] | Buff, Michel Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92905247.0 | 07.01.1992 | [1993/43] | WO1992US00214 | Priority number, date | US19910638912 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: US 638912 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212195 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566693 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C09D167/00, C09D11/10, C08L67/00, C08L77/12, // (C08L67/00, 33:00),(C08L77/12, 33:00) | [1993/43] | CPC: |
C09D11/10 (EP,US);
C08J3/00 (KR);
C08J3/005 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MISCHUNGEN AUS POLYESTERN UND ACRYLPOLYMEREN | [1993/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING BLENDS OF POLYESTERS AND ACRYLIC POLYMERS | [1993/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MELANGES DE POLYESTERS ET DE POLYMERES ACRYLIQUES | [1993/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 14.09.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2276340 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0356341 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |