EP0525211 - LUMINOUS MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/05] | LUMINOUS MEMBER AND PAINT | ||
[1998/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORIYAMA, Hirofumi 9-22, Minami 3-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152 / JP | For all designated states MORIYAMA, Tomofumi 9-22, Minami 3-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152 / JP | For all designated states KANAI, Kiyoshi 17-18, Tairamachi 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152 / JP | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92905300.7 | 19.02.1992 | [1993/05] | WO1992JP00172 | Priority number, date | JP19910045323 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4532391 | JP19910013499U | 19.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1349991 U | JP19910018691U | 05.03.1991 Original published format: JP 1869191 U | JP19910066557U | 29.07.1991 Original published format: JP 6655791 U | [1993/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214799 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525211 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525211 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/00, C09K11/02, C09K11/08, C09D5/22 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
C09D127/18 (EP,US);
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09K11/02 (EP);
C09K11/025 (EP);
C09K11/08 (EP);
F21V33/006 (EP);
G09F13/20 (EP);
C08K3/10 (EP);
F21V15/01 (EP);
F21V9/30 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP);
F21W2131/107 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D127/18, C08L2666/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/05] | Title | German: | LICHTELEMENT | [1998/29] | English: | LUMINOUS MEMBER | [1998/29] | French: | ELEMENT LUMINEUX | [1998/29] |
Former [1993/05] | LICHTELEMENT UND LACK | ||
Former [1993/05] | LUMINOUS MEMBER AND PAINT | ||
Former [1993/05] | ELEMENT LUMINEUX ET PEINTURE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1992 | Translation filed | 03.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9112292 (COUVERCHEL DANIEL GEORGES [FR]); | [X]US4208300 (GRAVISSE PHILIPPE E [FR]); | [X]US3908055 (SUSUKI RINNOSUKE, et al); | [X]FR2168685 (GRAVISSE PHILIPPE [FR]); | [X]DE3910053 (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE]) | International search | [X]JPS55110177 (ELLESSE SPA); | [X]JPS6422987 (SINLOIHI CO LTD); | [X]JPS4929928B ; | [X]JPS58173182 (SHIGA PREFECTURE); | [X]JPS60131847 (GAKUNAN KOKI KK); | [X]JPS60226959 (WATANABE OSAMU, et al); | [X]JPS4714702B ; | [X]JPS5714658 (KOLLMER PETER); | [X]JPS5351443U ; | [X]JPS6126634 (MITSUYAMA NAGAO) |