EP0516841 - ORIFICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIEL INDUSTRIES, INC. 9753 Pine Lake Drive Houston, TX 77055 / US | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDRICK, Ray 22415 Goldstone Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
TATUM, Gary 6619 Brittany Park Lane Houston, TX 77066 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92905320.5 | 12.12.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991US09535 | Priority number, date | US19900629130 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629130 | US19900629150 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629150 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211464 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516841 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516841 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/42, G01F15/00, F15D1/02 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G01F1/42 (EP);
G01F15/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | F15D1/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/50] | Title | German: | DROSSELEINRICHTUNG | [1996/10] | English: | ORIFICE SYSTEM | [1992/50] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIAPHRAGME | [1992/50] |
Former [1992/50] | Drosseleinrichtung | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 06.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US652177 (GABEL HENRY F [US]); | [A]US1892906 ; | [A]US1938460 ; | [A]US2687748 (WHALEN JOHN W); | [A]US3176773 (HEADRICK RICHARD T, et al); | [A]US3273805 (HALL THOMAS E); | [A]US3986721 (DECKER JOHN W); | [A]US4593915 (SEGER HAROLD C [US], et al); | [A]US4633911 (LOHN PAUL [US]) |