EP0526608 - THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE TO CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBIOPHARM S.A. 15-17 rue des Terraux CH-1003 Lausanne / CH | For all designated states PATRINOVE 39, rue du Lieutenant-Colonel-Prévost 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states DEBIOPHARM S.A. 15-17 rue des Terraux CH-1003 Lausanne / CH | ||
For all designated states PATRINOVE 39, rue du Lieutenant-Colonel-Prévost F-69006 Lyon / FR | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUFFERT, Bruno 57, rue d'Auxonne F-21000 Dijon / FR | 02 /
GENNE, Philippe 6, Grand Rue F-21121 Ahuy / FR | 03 /
GUTIERREZ, Gilles 39, rue Lt.-Colonel-Prévost F-69006 Lyon / FR | 04 /
MAUVERNAY, Rolland-Yves 15-17, rue des Terreaux CH-1003 Lausanne / CH | [1993/06] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | ||
Former [1993/06] | Vuille, Roman (CH) Avenue Nestlé 55 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 92905338.7 | 24.02.1992 | [1993/06] | WO1992EP00408 | Priority number, date | CH19910000576 | 25.02.1991 Original published format: CH 57691 | CH19910003522 | 02.12.1991 Original published format: CH 352291 | [1993/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214467 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526608 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526608 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/49 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/49 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/06] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Mittel für die Behandlungder Resistenz gegen Arzneimittel bei Krebs | [1993/06] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE TO CANCERS | [1993/06] | French: | AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA RESISTANCE MULTIDROGUE DE CANCERS | [1993/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/06] | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.1996 | DK | 18.12.1996 | GR | 18.12.1996 | BE | 28.02.1997 | LU | 28.02.1997 | MC | 31.08.1997 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 18.12.1996 | |
DK | 18.12.1996 | ||
GR | 18.12.1996 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
MC | 01.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 18.12.1996 | |
DK | 18.12.1996 | ||
GR | 18.12.1996 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
MC | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 18.12.1996 | |
DK | 18.12.1996 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
MC | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 18.12.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
MC | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 18.12.1996 | |
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 18.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - Molecular Pharmacology, vol. 33, no. 4, avril 1988, (US), J.M. ZAMORA et al.: "Physical-chemical properties shared by compounds that modulate multidrug resistance in human leukemic cells", pages 454-462, voir abrégé; pages 457-458 | [Y] - Proceedings of the 77th Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research, Los Angeles, CA, 7-10 mai 1986, vol. 27, J.M. ZAMORA et al.: "Potentiation of Vinca alkaloid (VA) cytotoxicity by quinolines, acridines, indole alkaloids and aromatic amines", page 395, abrégé no. 1567, voir le document en entier | [Y] - International Journal of Cancer, vol. 46, no. 1, 15 juillet 1990, (Lausanne, CH), J.F. ELIASON et al.: "Human multi-drug-resistant cancer cells exhibit a high degree of selectivity for stereoisomers of verapamil and quinidine", pages 113-117, voir le document en entier | [X] - Tetrahedron Letters, vol. 27, no. 49, 1986, (GB), R.T. BROWN et al.: "Stereospecific synthesis of erythro Cinchona alkaloids from secologanin", pages 6005-6008, voir pages 6005-6006 | [X] - H. RIMPLER et al.: "Pharmazeutische Biologie II. Biogene Arzneistoffe", 1990, pages 437-440: "Cinchonae cortex", Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE, voir pages 439-440 | [X] - J.E.F. REYNOLDS et al.: "Martindale - The Extra Pharmacopoeia", 28 édition, 1982, page 1378, The Pharmaceutical Press, Londres, GB, voir monographie no. 7786-v: "Hydroquinidine hydrochloride" | [X] - S. BUDAVARI et al.: "The Merck Index", 11 édition, 1989, page 356, Merck & Co., Rahway, NJ, US, voir monographie no 2289: "Cinchonine" | [X] - S. BUDAVARI et al.: "The Merck Index", 11 édition, 1989, page 762, Merck & Co., Rahway, NJ, US, voir monographie no. 4736: "Hydroquinidine" | [Y] - Ann. Ist. Super. Sanita, vol. 21, no. 3, 1985, (IT), D.C. WARHURST: "New drugs and their potential use against drug-resistant malaria", pages 327-336, voir abrégé; pages 328-329 | [Y] - Nature, vol. 345, 17 mai 1990, (Londres, GB), C. NEWBOLD: "The path of drug resistance", pages 202-203, voir page 202 | [Y] - Annals of Tropical Medicine and parasitology, vol. 69, no. 4, décembre 1975, (Liverpool, GB), N.M. MATTOCK et al.: "The experimental chemotherapy of leishmaniasis. III. Detection of antileishmanial activity in some new synthetic compounds in a tissue culture model", pages 449-462, voir page 456 | [X] - Therapie, vol. 43, no. 4, juin/juillet 1988, B. FLOUVAT et al.: "Métabolites de la dihydroquinidine observés après administration à l'homme d'une formulation à libération prolongée", pages 255-261, voir l'abrégé | [X] - J. Chem. Soc. Perkin Trans. I, 1988, M. IHARA et al.: "Total synthesis of hydrocinchonidine and hydrocinchonine via photo-oxygenation of an indole derivative", pages 1277-1281, voir l'abrégé; schémas 1-4 | Examination | - Cancer Research 52, 1992, pages 2797 - 2801 |