EP0525160 - FOLDING BOX WITH INNER BAG AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL EDELMANN GMBH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states Carl Edelmann GmbH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUBERGER, Erich Taxisstrasse 22 D-89561 Trugenhofen / DE | 02 /
KNÖRRICH, Wolf-Dieter Ludwig-Richter-Strasse 66 D-89561 Heidenheim / DE | [1995/18] |
Former [1993/05] | 01 /
HEUBERGER, Erich Taxisstrasse 22 D-7925 Trugenhofen / DE | ||
02 /
KNÖRRICH, Wolf-Dieter Ludwig-Richter-Strasse 66 D-7920 Heidenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Körner, Ekkehard Patentanwalt Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92905491.4 | 14.02.1992 | [1993/05] | WO1992DE00116 | Priority number, date | DE19914104559 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4104559 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214652 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525160 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525160 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/60, B31B7/00 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B65D5/606 (EP,US);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B31B2120/408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/18] |
Former [1993/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | FALTSCHACHTEL MIT INNENBEUTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1993/05] | English: | FOLDING BOX WITH INNER BAG AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [1993/05] | French: | BOITE PLIANTE AVEC UN SACHET INTERIEUR ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [1993/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.05.1995 | DK | 03.05.1995 | ES | 03.05.1995 | FR | 03.05.1995 | GB | 03.05.1995 | GR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | NL | 03.05.1995 | SE | 03.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
ES | 03.05.1995 | ||
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
NL | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
ES | 03.05.1995 | ||
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
GB | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 03.05.1995 | |
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 29.09.1995 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2095910 (BERGSTEIN ROBERT M); | [Y]FR1130835 (CENPA); | [A]US3426955 (OLSON JEROME F); | [Y]FR2504094 (BERNHARDT CIE [FR]) |