EP0573500 - FUSED GENES AND THEIR USE FOR DETERMINING THE PRESENCE OF METALS OR OF XENOBIOTIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITO Boeretang 200 B-2400 Mol / BE | [1993/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBISIER, Philippe 19,rue Haute Marcelle B-5000 Namur / BE | 02 /
MERGEAY, Maximilien Peperstraat 30 B-2470 Retie / BE | 03 /
DIELS, Ludovicus Schildesteenweg 1 B-2250 Oelegem / BE | [1998/17] |
Former [1993/50] | 01 /
CORBISIER, Philippe 19, Haute Marcelle Street B-5000 Namur / BE | ||
02 /
MERGEAY, Maximilien Peperstraat 30 B-2470 Retie / BE | |||
03 /
DIELS, Ludovicus Schildesteenweg 1 B-2250 Oelegem / BE | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92905525.9 | 28.02.1992 | [1993/50] | WO1992EP00445 | Priority number, date | EP9100385 | 01.03.1991 Original published format: EP 9100385 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215687 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573500 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573500 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0573500 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/31, C12N15/53, C12N1/21, C12Q1/66, G01N33/58, G01N33/84 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N9/0069 (EP,US);
C12Q1/025 (EP,US);
C12Q1/66 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
G01N33/0049 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | FUSIONIERTE GENE SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON METALL- UND XENOBIOTIKAGEHALTEN | [1999/24] | English: | FUSED GENES AND THEIR USE FOR DETERMINING THE PRESENCE OF METALS OR OF XENOBIOTIC COMPOUNDS | [1993/50] | French: | GENES FUSIONNES ET UTILISATION DE CES GENES POUR DETERMINER LA PRESENCE DE METAUX OU DE COMPOSES XENOBIOTIQUES | [1993/50] |
Former [1993/50] | Fusionierte Gene sowie deren Verwendungzur Bestimmung von Metall- und Xenobiotikagehalten | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.1999
10.07.2000
WITHDRAWN E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US Opponent's representative Howard, Paul Nicholas Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.1999
E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Del. 19898 / US Opponent's representative Howard, Paul Nicholas Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 25.02.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.10.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.08.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.01.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 22.04.1998 | DK | 22.07.1998 | MC | 31.08.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/18] | GR | 22.04.1998 | |
MC | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 22.04.1998 | |
MC | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 22.04.1998 | |
MC | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | MC | 31.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9008836 (GENLUX FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT [DE]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 11, 11 September 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 91344Q, M. BOYLAN ET AL.: 'Lux C, D and E genes of Vibrio fischeri luminescence operon code for the reductase, transferase, and synthetase enzymes involved in aldehyde biosynthesis' page 189 ;column L ; | [A] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 171, no. 10, October 1989, BALTIMORE, US pages 5467 - 5472; K. FURUKAWA ET AL.: 'Molecular Relationship of Chromosomal Genes Encoding Biphenyl/Polychlorinated Biphenyl Catabolism: Some Soil Bacteria Possess a Highly Conserved bph Operon' |