EP0573514 - TOOTHBRUSH HAVING HANDLE JOINED TO BRUSH HEAD BY NON-PINCHING FLEXIBLE TWIN BEAM STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIRKSING, Robert, Stanley 7188 Wyandotte Drive Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 92905731.3 | 30.01.1992 | [1993/50] | WO1992US00681 | Priority number, date | US19910662852 | 01.03.1991 Original published format: US 662852 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215225 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573514 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573514 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
A46B5/0066 (EP,US);
A46B5/0062 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | ZAHNBUERSTE MIT NICHT KNEIFENDER DOPPELBALKENVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON BUERSTENKOPF UND GRIFF | [1993/50] | English: | TOOTHBRUSH HAVING HANDLE JOINED TO BRUSH HEAD BY NON-PINCHING FLEXIBLE TWIN BEAM STRUCTURE | [1993/50] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS COMPORTANT UN MANCHE RELIE A LA TETE AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF A DEUX BRANCHES SOUPLE ET ANTI-PINCEMENT | [1993/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.1995 | BE | 22.11.1995 | CH | 22.11.1995 | DK | 22.11.1995 | ES | 22.11.1995 | FR | 22.11.1995 | GR | 22.11.1995 | LI | 22.11.1995 | NL | 22.11.1995 | LU | 31.01.1996 | GB | 22.02.1996 | SE | 22.02.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
CH | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
ES | 22.11.1995 | ||
GR | 22.11.1995 | ||
LI | 22.11.1995 | ||
NL | 22.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
CH | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
ES | 22.11.1995 | ||
GR | 22.11.1995 | ||
LI | 22.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
CH | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
GR | 22.11.1995 | ||
LI | 22.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
GR | 22.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1996 | ||
LI | 28.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
GR | 22.11.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
DK | 22.11.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1996 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/37] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
FR | 19.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
BE | 22.11.1995 | ||
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 22.11.1995 | |
SE | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 22.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4520526 (PETERS CHARLES W [US]) |