EP0533940 - CRYSTALLINE POTASSIUM THIONICOTINAMIDE-ADENINE DINUCLEOTIDE PHOSPHATE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORIENTAL YEAST CO., LTD. 6-10, Azusawa 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states ORIENTAL YEAST CO., LTD. 6-10, Azusawa 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGITA, Kouji Kandaimaesukaihaitsu C-412, 3-17, Yamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka-fu 564 / JP | 02 /
KITAHARA, Tetsuo 1-105, Ooniwa-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 03 /
NONOBE, Masatsugu 2-23, Tsutsujigaokaminami 1-chome Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken 669-16 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Tsuyosi 2-16, Satsukigaoka 2-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka-fu 563 / JP | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 92905968.1 | 05.03.1992 | [1993/13] | WO1992JP00260 | Priority number, date | JP19910123182 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: JP 12318291 | [1993/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215527 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533940 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
C07H19/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/13] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE KALIUM THIONICOTINAMID-ADENIN-DINUKLEOTID PHOSPHAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1993/13] | English: | CRYSTALLINE POTASSIUM THIONICOTINAMIDE-ADENINE DINUCLEOTIDE PHOSPHATE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1993/13] | French: | POTASSIUM CRISTALLIN DE PHOSPHATE THIONICOTINAMIDE-ADENINE DINUCLEOTIDE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1993/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1992 | Translation filed | 26.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 26.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/02] | 15.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2704109 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) | International search | [A]JPS4714919B |