EP0577629 - NOVEL HERBICIDALLY, ACARICIDALLY AND INSECTICIDALLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEDERBAUM, Frederik Kurzelängeweg 34 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
BRUNNER, Hans-Georg Wannenstrasse 14 CH-4415 Lausen / CH | 03 /
BÖGER, Manfred Wilhelm Glockstrasse 14 D-7858 Weil am Rhein 5 / DE | [1994/02] | Application number, filing date | 92906087.9 | 02.03.1992 | [1994/02] | WO1992EP00452 | Priority number, date | CH19910000826 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: CH 82691 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216510 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577629 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577629 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/32, A01N43/56, C07D487/04, C07D401/12 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
C07C251/76 (EP,US);
C07C251/78 (EP,US);
C07C281/02 (EP,US);
C07C281/04 (EP,US);
C07D231/32 (EP,US);
C07D237/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT HERBIZIDEN,ACARIZIDER UND INSEKTIZIDER WIRKUNG | [1994/02] | English: | NOVEL HERBICIDALLY, ACARICIDALLY AND INSECTICIDALLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS | [1994/02] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES POSSEDANT UNE EFFICACITE HERBICIDE, INSECTICIDE ET ACARICIDE | [1994/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0011693 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0042100 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]EP0094095 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]EP0106251 (EDMOND PHARMA SRL [IT]) |