EP0531539 - LYOPHILIZED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Tamotsu 2142, Tougou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken 297 / JP | 02 /
SHIMAZAKI, Yukio 1539-2, Tougou Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken 297 / JP | 03 /
KUROIWA, Yasuyuki 2791-1, Mutuno Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken 297 / JP | 04 /
TAKAGI, Shiro 2141, Tougo Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken 29 / JP | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr. Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92906211.5 | 28.02.1992 | [1993/11] | WO1992JP00226 | Priority number, date | JP19910043431 | 08.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4343191 | [1993/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215331 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531539 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531539 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/1214 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/50] |
Former [1993/11] | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | LYOPHILISCHE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPERPRÄPARATIONEN | [1993/11] | English: | LYOPHILIZED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY PREPARATION | [1993/11] | French: | PREPARATION LYOPHILISEE D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1992 | Translation filed | 02.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97120255.1 / EP0841067 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0190041 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9011091 (CENTOCOR INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0140489 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0177836 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2149304 (PETER MASUCCI) [A] 2 * column W * | International search | [Y]JPS58167518 (NIHON SEKIJIYUUJISHIYA); | [Y]JPS60146833 (GREEN CROSS CORP) |