Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0585237
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.07.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] |
21.07.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] |
12.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.03.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
02.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
11.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.01.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] |
21.01.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] |